CA AB3020 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17206 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unfair Practices Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3020 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 30).
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17.)
2020-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 27).
2020-05-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17206Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback