CA AB2969 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19596.2 and 19613 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: out-of-state thoroughbred races: Blue Grass Stakes: pension plan or program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2969 Governmental Organizatio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2969 G.O. (Santiago) By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2969 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2969 G.O. (Santiago) By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2969 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5129.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4584.) |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19596.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19613 | Amended Code | Citation Text |