CA AB2882 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17213 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 17235) to Chapter 1 of Part 10.5 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 21151.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to schoolsites.
Title
Hazardous emissions and substances: schoolsites: private and charter schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2882 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 4773.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21151.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |