CA AB2810 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26061 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 65000) and Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 65100) to Part 2 of Division 22 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: cultivation licenses: Sun-Grown Cannabis Commission and Indoor-Grown Cannabis Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
2018-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26061Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code65000New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code65100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback