CA AB279 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 605 of the San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority Act (Chapter 776 of the Statutes of 1992), relating to water.
Title
San Gabriel Basin Water Quality Authority: annual pumping right assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB279 Blanca Rubio et al. By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 279 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - AB 279 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2351.). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1073.) |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |