CA AB2774 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 6432 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Occupational safety and health.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Asm. Warren Furutani [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2774 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2774 Swanson By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2774 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2774 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON Amend By SWANSON Set #1 (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2774 Swanson By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2774 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2774 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By SWANSON Amend By SWANSON Set #1 (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6713.) | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4828.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14) | |
2010-08-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-08-11 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2010-08-10 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 5515.) | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 5340.). | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2010-04-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. | |
2010-03-01 | Read first time. To print. |