CA AB276 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18926.5 of, and to add Sections 18923.5 and 18926.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to social services.
Title
CalFresh eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18923.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18926.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18926.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_276&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0251-0300/ab_276_bill_20130211_introduced.html |