CA AB2753 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.005 of, and to add Section 1342.9 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.27 of, and to add Section 10112.275 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Rehabilitative and habilitative services: durable medical equipment and services.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1342.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.275 | New Code | See Bill Text |