CA AB2726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38511 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: consumption-based accounting.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 24503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 351 | New Code | See Bill Text |