CA AB2723 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 664.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: entry of judgment: written stipulation.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2723 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2723 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2723 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2723 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2723 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5329.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 664.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |