CA AB2719 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21080.36 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemptions: highway safety improvement projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |