CA AB2684 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Safety element: extreme heat.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2684 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2684 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 5). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 8). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.M. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |