CA AB2684 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1206.5, 2242.2, 2571, 2701, 2706, 2708, 2717, 2746.51, 2746.53, 2786, 2786.2, 2786.3, 2786.5, 2815, 2815.5, 2836.3, 2837.104, 3703, 4024, 4040, 4060, 4061, 4170, and 4174 of, and to add Sections 2785.6, 2786.4, and 2837.103.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2684 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2684 Berman et al. By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2684 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By FLORA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2684 Berman et al. By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2684 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By FLORA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4945.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |