CA AB2661 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4709 of the Labor Code, relating to death benefits.
Title
Death benefits: tribal firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2661 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2661 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2661 Waldron Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4131.). |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4469.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |