CA AB2632 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12606 and 12606.2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 110375 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to packaging and labeling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Packaging and labeling: containers: slack fill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2632 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2632 Santiago By Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2632 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6909.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5906.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5429.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback