CA AB2622 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 401.17, 441, and 1153.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: certificated aircraft assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2622 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2622 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 5080.) |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1153 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1153.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 401.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |