CA AB2603 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11350 and 11377 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: permissive lawful possession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2603 PEREZ, V.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2603 V. Manuel P (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2603 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2603 V. Manuel P (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2603 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6114.). |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4499.). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5221.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5088.) |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |