CA AB2602 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18285 of, and to add Section 18286 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to license plate revenue, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Child health and safety: “Have a Heart, Be a Star, Help Our Kids” license plate program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18286 | New Code | See Bill Text |