CA AB257 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 96 of, and to add Part 4.5.5 (commencing with Section 1470) to Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to food facilities and employment.
Title
Food facilities and employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB257 Holden et al. By Durazo (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - AB 257 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 257 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 257 Holden Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - AB 257 Assembly Third Reading By HOLDEN Amendment Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 257 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - AB 257 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 257 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 257 Holden Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - AB 257 Assembly Third Reading By HOLDEN Amendment Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 257 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 19.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 5185.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 13). |
2022-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 21. Page 3423.) |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 44. Noes 16. Page 3397.) |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 13. Page 3346.) |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.) |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.) |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 47.1 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.) |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Lorena Gonzalez. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 2124.) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Lorena Gonzalez. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 27. Page 1909.). |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1059.) |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1470 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |