CA AB2548 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48000.15 of the Education Code, relating to transitional kindergarten.
Title
Transitional kindergarten: enrollment.
Sponsors
Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48000.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |