CA AB251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14527.3 of the Government Code, relating to the California Transportation Commission.
Title
California Transportation Commission: vehicle weight safety study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 251 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB251 Ward et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 251 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB251 Ward et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 251 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 3187.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2461.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 1712.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14527.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |