CA AB251 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66022.5 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: admission by exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB251 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 251 Choi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 251 Choi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1636.). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 929.) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66022.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |