CA AB2506 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 155.30 and 167.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: local exemption: possessory interests: publicly owned housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 155.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 167.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |