CA AB2494 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66025.71 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: course credit for prior military education, training, and service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2494 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4727.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |