CA AB2481 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16522 of the Government Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2481 MORRELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |
2012-06-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-23 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |
2012-05-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4708.) | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 5003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |