CA AB2460 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19225.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: Bureau of Household Goods and Services: household movers.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2460 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4766.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19225.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |