CA AB2436 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21283, 21283.5, 21285, 21288, 21288.5, 21290.5, 21563, and 21563.5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to cattle, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Cattle: inspections: fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Alanis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2436 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2436 Alanis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 21283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21283.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21288.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21290.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21563.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |