CA AB241 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2190.1 and 3524.5 of, and to add Section 2736.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implicit bias: continuing education: requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 241 Kamlager-Dove Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Kamlager-Dove et al. By Wiener (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 241 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 3013.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2460.).
2019-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 1625.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 8).
2019-05-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-04-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2019-01-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2190.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2736.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code3524.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback