CA AB241 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 1450) to Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 1454 of, the Labor Code, relating to domestic work employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic work employees: labor standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 241 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Ammiano By De Le (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 241 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3296.).
2013-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2013-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2355.).
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2013-08-19SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1737.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2013-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1450New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1454Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3351Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3352Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3551Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3708Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3715Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_241&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130206_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130701_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20130926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130424_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130529_0239PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130626_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130819_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130830_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130911_0514PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20130912_1129AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback