CA AB2405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4437.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4437.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8258.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing.
Title
Right to safe, decent, and affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2405 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2405 Burke et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2405 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2405 Burke et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2405 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4437.). | |
2020-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 5367.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 4788.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8258.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |