CA AB2385 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 78265) of Chapter 2 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Pilot Program for Innovative Nursing and Allied Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2385 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2385 John A. Perez By Padilla (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2385 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2385 John A. Perez By Padilla (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2385 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 6638.) | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4778.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 5566.) | |
2010-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |