CA AB238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1714.27 to the Civil Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 19305) to Part 3 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency response.
Title
Emergency response: trauma kits.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 238 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 238 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1614.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19334.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1714.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19305 | New Code | See Bill Text |