CA AB235 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB235 Gatto Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 235 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 235 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1745.). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1330.). |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |