CA AB2345 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44260 and 44260.1 of, and to add Section 44841 to, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Short-term staff permits: provisional intern permits: teaching permits for statutory leave: designated subjects career technical education teaching credentials: cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2345 Jim Patterson et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2345 Jim Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2345 Jim Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-06-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4492.). |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4998.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44260.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44841 | New Code | See Bill Text |