CA AB2329 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49455.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: eye examinations: schoolsites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2329 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2329 Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2329 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2329 Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2329 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5221.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4579.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49455.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |