CA AB2312 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.7 (commencing with Section 111823) to Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to contraception.
Title
Nonprescription contraception: access.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111823 | New Code | See Bill Text |