CA AB2272 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 17 (commencing with Section 6250) to Chapter 4 of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to housing.
Title
Eviction: education, outreach, and legal services: short-term rental assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2272 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2272 |