CA AB2265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 12.5 (commencing with Section 4178) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Pharmacy: dispensing controlled substances: lockable vials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 5). |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4178 | New Code | See Bill Text |