CA AB2263 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing Section 69680) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Golden State Apprenticeship and Vocational Training Emergency Assistance Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |