CA AB2255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16120 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services.
Title
Adoption Assistance Program: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |