CA AB2253 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4880 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services programs: qualified ABLE Program accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |