CA AB2245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 872.020, 874.311, 874.312, 874.313, 874.314, 874.316, 874.319, 874.320, 874.321, and 374.321.5 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 874.311) of Title 10.5 of Part 2 of, and to repeal Section 874.322 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to property.
Title
Partition of real property.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2245 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2245 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2245 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4265.). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4613.) |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 374.321.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 872.020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.314 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.319 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 874.322 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |