CA AB2222 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44372, 44373, 44374, 52073.1, 60119, 60200, 60200.4, and 60210 of, to add Sections 44265.1, 44374.1, 44374.2, 60011, 60207.5, and 92668.5 to, and to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 44755) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to early literacy.
Title
Science of Reading: accreditation: professional development: instructional materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44265.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44373 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44374 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44374.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44374.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52073.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60200.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60207.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92668.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |