CA AB2183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1160.10 and 1162 to, and to add and repeal Sections 1156.35, 1156.36, and 1156.37 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Agricultural labor relations: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2183 Stone et al. By Durazo (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2183 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2183 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2183 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2183 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5177.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 4929.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 24 corrected. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1156.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1156.36 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1156.37 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1160.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1162 | New Code | See Bill Text |