CA AB2169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10500 and 10855 of the Vehicle Code, relating to rented vehicles.
Title
Leased and rented vehicles: embezzlement and theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 2169 VOEPEL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2169 Voepel By Bates (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2169 VOEPEL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2169 Voepel By Bates (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2169 VOEPEL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-08-27 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6205.). |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5163.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 10500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 10855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |