CA AB2166 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 78017.5 to the Education Code, to amend Section 2272 of, to add Sections 25.3, 437, 823, and 825 to, and to add Division 23.5 (commencing with Section 80500) to, the Food and Agricultural Code, to add and repeal Sections 17053.89 and 23608.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to add Section 301.5 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Farm Bill: agricultural technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and HIGHER ED.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78017.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code2272Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code25.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code437New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code823New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code825New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code301.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code17053.89New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code23608.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback