CA AB2130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 43152.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: Hazardous Substance Tax Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43152.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2130 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2130 |