CA AB213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Claims against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 213 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB213 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - AB 213 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB213 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - AB 213 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2915.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2347.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2430.). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |