CA AB2105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7137 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: initial license fee reduction: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - AB 2105 Smith Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2105 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2105 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5811.). |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and M. & V.A. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4578.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |