CA AB2092 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66011.3 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: Donahoe Higher Education Act: 4-year baccalaureate degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66011.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66725 | Amended Code | Citation Text |